U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moss
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Variance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Information - Felony]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.