U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00305-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dantzler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 04, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 27, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 27, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.