U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00181-3
  • Case Name: USA v. PALOMEQUE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Factual Resume]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Document Referred]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • December 12, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.