U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RODGERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [In Limine]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.