U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00109-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Gibson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 03, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 02, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 12, 2025: [Variance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2025: [Continue Trial]
November, 2024
  • November 26, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.