U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shultz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Indictment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [In Camera Hearing ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 02, 2024: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.