U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00286-7
  • Case Name: USA v. HOLLOWAY, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K1.1]
  • May 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 24, 2025: [Downward Departure - SEALED - 5K1.1 ONLY]
  • April 23, 2025: [Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 17, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 10, 2025: [Continue]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Reply to Response ]
  • December 15, 2024: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2024: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 02, 2024: [Suppress]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.