U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00026-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Stewart et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 09, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Non-Appeal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.