U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STRONG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 04, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.