U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.