U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 24, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [Order on Motion to Detain]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.