U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00472-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLLINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Process Receipt and Return]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Juror Questionnaire Certification]
  • April 15, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 15, 2025: [Jury Verdict ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Courts Jury Charge]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Acquittal ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Courts Preliminary Instructions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 07, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence]
  • March 31, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 31, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 31, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 26, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.