U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00090-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Castaneda et al (Interpreter)
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Detainer Lodged]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.