U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00487-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ANDERSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.