U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.