U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Argueta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • March 07, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.