U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00469-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JEMISON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.