U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00352-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • March 10, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 10, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 10, 2025: [In Limine]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.