U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00358-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief/Response in Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response ]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.