U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00783
  • Case Name: Baker v. City of Montgomery
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 14, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.