U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Reese v. Collins (INMATE 1)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Deadline]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Status]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.