U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Smith v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.