U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00444-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brittingham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Process Receipt and Return]
  • March 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 13, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 12, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • March 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.