U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00183
  • Case Name: The Smith Law Firm, PLLC v. Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis and Miles, P.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 09, 2025: [Create Case Association]
  • April 04, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.