U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Jones v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer]
  • April 15, 2025: [Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [AO FORM 85]
  • April 07, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 04, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
  • March 14, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
  • March 14, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.