U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Burton v. Headley et al (INMATE 2)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Default Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.