U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00470-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VARDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Suppress]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.