U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scariano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 23, 2025: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 12, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.