U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Little v. U.S. Xpress, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 28, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer due deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.