U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Gelinas v. Southern Dentistry, P.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Filing Proposed Summons]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 03, 2025: [Substitute Party]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer due deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.