U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00069
  • Case Name: NERco, LLC et al v. Voodoo Licensing Southern, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Filing Proposed Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • March 13, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.