U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Viarengo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.