U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kahanek
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detain]
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.