U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tecum-Tecum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 14, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • March 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Interpreter]
  • March 10, 2025: [Motions Referred]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.