U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • April 08, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • March 18, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.