U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stots
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.