U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Kelly v. Coolray of Alabama, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.