U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00431
  • Case Name: Krishmar-Junker v. Kingline Equipment, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Filing Discovery]
  • April 28, 2025: [Disqualify Judge]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Filing Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Filing Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.