U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Hodges-Matthews v. Bethune-McQuiddy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.