U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00471-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DAWKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.