U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00816
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Geerhart et al(MAG+)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.