U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Hamm (DEATH PENALTY)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Inmate 1983 Complaint, Amended]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint, Amended]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.