U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00434-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HALSEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.