U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Reese v. Lovegood et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.