U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Owens v. BP Exploration & Production Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Filing Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice - B3 Cases Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.