U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yanez-Alvarez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.