U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CENTENO-MELCHOR (INTERPRETER)
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 30, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.