U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Ross v. Lowe's Home Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.