U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Overspray USA LLC et al v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order to Dismiss on Settlement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • March 18, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.