U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROMERO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.